+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 2
- House/ uncircled
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 2, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2021: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 2
February 18, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7
February 18, 2021: House/ uncircled
February 11, 2021: House/ circled
February 3, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor