+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (9)
March 4, 2013: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
February 27, 2013: Senate/ circled
February 14, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2013: House/ floor amendment
February 4, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor