+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ to Senate
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 22, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2017: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2017: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2017: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 15, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 3
February 2, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2017: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor