+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 6, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
February 8, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 3, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
February 1, 2012: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor