+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 29, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 15, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2014: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 14, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor