+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
March 8, 2018: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 8, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor