+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On December 22, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 21, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor