+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 3, 2022 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2022: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 24, 2022: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 15, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 4
February 11, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2022: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor