+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 21, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
January 28, 2005: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor