+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ motion to reconsider passed
- House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 23, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 7
February 8, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor