+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ to Senate
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 6, 2009: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2009: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 29
February 3, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
January 27, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor