+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 9, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 3, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
January 31, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor