+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 19, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 19, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 18, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 30, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On September 26, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Vote
February 25, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor