+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ motion to reconsider failed
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ held for reconsideration
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendments (5)
Senate Amendment # 6
Passed
House Amendment # 2
Passed
House Amendment # 4
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2006: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 1
February 13, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 23, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 14
January 17, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor