+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 4
February 12, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Rep. Seegmiller, F.J.
Type:
Primary Sponsor