+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ uncircled
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 9, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 6, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
January 30, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
January 27, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor