+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 16, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2004: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 19, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 18, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 2, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
January 21, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor