+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted/ amend
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Held
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
House Amendment # 2
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Vote
March 4, 2013: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor