+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2010: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 24, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 16, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 9
January 29, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor