+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
March 2, 2012: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
March 1, 2012: Senate/ floor amendment
March 1, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 29, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
February 29, 2012: Senate/ uncircled
February 29, 2012: Senate/ substituted
February 23, 2012: Senate/ circled
February 22, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor