+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2006: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
February 17, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 5
February 10, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor