+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Filed
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to House
- Senate/enacting clause struck
- Senate/read 3rd
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd (Suspension)
- Senate/from Rules Comm to 2nd
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received from House
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Read 3rd Time
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- House Rules Comm to 3rd Reading Calendar
- 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Comm
On February 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Report Favorable/Amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
On January 13, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor