+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Reconsider actions
- House/ 2nd reading
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2021: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2021: House Comm - Reconsider actions
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor