+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ uncircled
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 2, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor