+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 18, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 15, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor