+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 13, 2004 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
February 25, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7
February 19, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 7
February 3, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor