+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On December 31, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On December 27, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 21, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 20, 2007 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 20, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2008: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2008: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor