+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 31, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor