+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 29, 2020 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
February 17, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 4
February 3, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 5
February 3, 2021: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor