+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 6, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 23, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 22, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
January 29, 2010: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor