+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 1, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 10, 2014: House/ floor amendment
March 10, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 6
February 26, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor