+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor