+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 22, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor