+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 6, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On December 3, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 29
February 13, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 5
January 29, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor