+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 17, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Governor
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- House Signed by Speaker/Enrolled
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
- House Concurs with Senate Amendments
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received from House
- Senate/signed by President to House
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- House Placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
On February 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to House with amendments
- Senate/pass 3rd
- Senate/read 3rd
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/placed on 2nd
- Senate/comm report/ substitute
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Committee
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Standing Committee
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received from House
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Amended
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 3rd Time
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm Report Favorable/Amended
- House Read 2nd Time
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
On December 20, 2002 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2003: House Concurs with Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 14, 2003: Senate/pass 3rd
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
January 24, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor