+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ read 2nd time
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2006: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 9, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 6, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
January 23, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
January 18, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor