+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor