+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Rules Committee
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 13, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 9, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
January 23, 2004: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor