+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ amended
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ amended
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 12, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor