+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 13, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ motion to reconsider/ passed
- House/ motion to reconsider
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ amended
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 15, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 29
February 27, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 14, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2006: House/ failed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 41
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor