+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Filed
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to House
- Senate/enacting clause struck
- Senate/read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/from Rules Comm to 2nd
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/received from House
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Senate
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Amended
- House Read 3rd Time
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- House Rules Comm to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Comm
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 3rd Time
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Rpt Favorable/Substituted
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
On December 16, 2002 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 12, 2002 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 27, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor