+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ substituted by Rules
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 8, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor