+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 4, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 7, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 6, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 75
February 6, 2017: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 6, 2017: House/ uncircled
January 24, 2017: House/ circled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor