+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted
- House/ to Senate
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- House/ circled
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
February 1, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor