+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
January 27, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 26, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
January 26, 2022: House/ uncircled
January 25, 2022: House/ circled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor