+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 21, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 20, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor