+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 22, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 14, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 11, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 23, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Vote
January 26, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor