+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 21, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On December 18, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 15, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 29, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On November 20, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 17, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (3)
February 2, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 30, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
January 18, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor