+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 9, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 9, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 62
- Absent: 13
March 9, 2016: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
March 2, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 2, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 25, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 5
February 4, 2016: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor