+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 5, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 18, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 17, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2007: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 5
February 16, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 15, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 12, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 3
January 23, 2007: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor